Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/25/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/05/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/31/2011