Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/14/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2012