There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Afghanistan Exit and Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the President to transmit to Congress a plan with timeframe and completion date and reports with status updates on the transition of United States military and security operations in Afghanistan to the Government of Afghanistan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/05/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/05/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/23/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/23/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/23/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/01/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 08/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/05/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs05/05/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1735.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1735. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2011)

Afghanistan Exit and Accountability Act - Requires the President to submit to Congress, within 60 days after the enactment of this Act, a plan with a time frame and completion date for the accelerated transition of U.S. military and security operations in Afghanistan to the government of Afghanistan.

Directs the President, within 90 days after the submission of such plan and every 90 days thereafter, to report on the plan's current status. Requires such reports to include the estimated savings, immediately and over 5-, 10-, and 20-year periods, if U.S. military and security operations in Afghanistan were concluded and U.S. Armed Forces were redeployed from Afghanistan within 180 days after the date of each report.