Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/23/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/23/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/23/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/01/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 08/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2012