Text: H.R.1735 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1735


To require the President to transmit to Congress a plan with timeframe and completion date and reports with status updates on the transition of United States military and security operations in Afghanistan to the Government of Afghanistan.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

May 5, 2011

Mr. McGovern (for himself, Mr. Jones, Ms. Loretta Sanchez of California, Mr. Chaffetz, Mr. Loebsack, Mr. Paul, Mr. Garamendi, Mr. Duncan of Tennessee, Mr. Lewis of Georgia, Mr. Johnson of Illinois, Mr. Cicilline, Mr. Amash, Ms. Slaughter, Mr. Bartlett, Mr. Welch, and Mr. Moran) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To require the President to transmit to Congress a plan with timeframe and completion date and reports with status updates on the transition of United States military and security operations in Afghanistan to the Government of Afghanistan.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Afghanistan Exit and Accountability Act”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) On November 29, 2009, in the Final Orders for Afghanistan/Pakistan Strategy, President Barack Obama wrote that sending significant additional United States troops in early 2010 would set the conditions for an “accelerated transition to Afghan authorities beginning in July 2011”.

(2) Operation Enduring Freedom in Afghanistan is America’s longest conflict, with October 7, 2011, marking the 10-year anniversary of the start of United States military operations in Afghanistan.

(3) Military operations in Afghanistan have cost United States taxpayers $336,000,000,000 in deficit spending from October 2001 through fiscal year 2010, with an additional $100,000,000,000 appropriated in deficit spending for fiscal year 2011.

(4) As of March 15, 2011, over 1,500 members of the United States Armed Forces have lost their lives in support of Operation Enduring Freedom in Afghanistan and over 10,000 have been wounded.

(5) In November 2010, the Department of Defense reported that suicide rates are soaring among veterans, and the backlog at the Department of Veterans Affairs had reached more than 700,000 disability cases, including cases involving post traumatic stress disorder.

(6) The combined costs of the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan are currently estimated to account for 23 percent of the United States deficit for the period 2003 to 2010.

(7) Nobel Prize-winning economist and Columbia University Professor Joseph Stiglitz estimates that the costs of the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan, including interest payments on the money borrowed for these wars and care for wounded soldiers and veterans, are likely to total $4,000,000,000,000 to $6,000,000,000,000.

(8) On December 1, 2009, at a speech at the United States Military Academy at West Point, President Barack Obama stated that the United States would begin withdrawing United States Armed Forces from Afghanistan in July 2011.

SEC. 3. Plan with timeframe and completion date and reports with status updates on transition of United States military and security operations in Afghanistan to the Government of Afghanistan.

(a) Plan with timeframe and completion date required.—Not later than 60 days after the date of the enactment of this Act, the President shall transmit to Congress a plan with a timeframe and completion date for the accelerated transition of United States military and security operations (including operations involving military and security-related contractors) in Afghanistan to the Government of Afghanistan.

(b) Report with status updates required.—Not later than 90 days after the date of transmission of the plan required by subsection (a), and every 90 days thereafter, the President shall transmit to Congress a report setting forth the current status of such plan, including the following information:

(1) Progress on completing the redeployment of United States Armed Forces from Afghanistan and the accelerated transition of military and security operations to the Government of Afghanistan.

(2) The total number of United States Armed Forces deployed in Afghanistan over the reporting period, including military and security-related contractors, logistical support, and maintenance for bases and facilities utilized by the Armed Forces.

(3) The total number of United States Armed Forces permanently withdrawn and redeployed from Afghanistan during the reporting period, including Guard and Reserves, that will not be replenished or replaced by new deployments or by military and security-related contractors.

(4) The total financial costs of maintaining United States Armed Forces in Afghanistan over the reporting period, including military and security-related contractors.

(5) The number of members of the United States Armed Forces killed or wounded in Afghanistan during each reporting period.

(6) The number of United States military personnel (active duty, Guard, Reserves, and veterans) who were or had been deployed to Afghanistan that committed suicide during the reporting period.

(7) The cost of providing care and benefits to Operation Enduring Freedom (OEF) veterans and members of the United States Armed Forces deployed in Afghanistan during each reporting period.

(8) The estimated amount of increased deficit and increased public debt attributed to continuing military operations in Afghanistan accrued during the reporting period and projected through 2020, including interest payments on money borrowed for OEF and the care and benefits for wounded soldiers and veterans.

(9) Information on variables that could advance the timetable and increase the rate of redeployment of United States Armed Forces from Afghanistan.

(c) Savings from accelerated redeployment.—Each report required under subsection (b) shall include the estimated savings, immediate and over 5-year, 10-year, and 20-year time periods, were United States military and security operations to be concluded and United States Armed Forces redeployed from Afghanistan within 180 days of the date of each report.