Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/25/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/01/2012