Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/22/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/06/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/11/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/11/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/11/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/03/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/03/2012