Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/31/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/02/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/21/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 08/23/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/03/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/24/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/22/2012