Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/17/2011