Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/25/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/31/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/21/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/21/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/21/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/09/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/23/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/14/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/14/2011