Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/14/2011