Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/18/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012