Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/06/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/19/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/19/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/19/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 08/19/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/19/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/19/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/30/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/30/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/02/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/02/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/02/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/09/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/06/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/19/2012