Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/05/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/21/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/24/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/11/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/18/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/29/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/09/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/12/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/17/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/23/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/25/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/31/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/02/2012