Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/11/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/02/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/20/2012