Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/15/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2012