Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/16/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/29/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/27/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/27/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/27/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/27/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/28/2012