Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/02/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/02/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/13/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/29/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/07/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/15/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/13/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/05/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/19/2012