Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/20/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/20/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/13/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/03/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/03/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/13/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/25/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/30/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/28/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2012