Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/23/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/10/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2012