Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/19/2011