Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/12/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/13/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/31/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/07/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/04/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/29/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/19/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/19/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/19/2011