Refine your search

Refined by:

Connecticut Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2011