Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/07/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/19/2011