Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2011