Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/19/2011