Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/19/2011