Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2011