Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/23/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/26/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/19/2011