Refine your search

Refined by:

Oregon Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/19/2011