Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/26/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/24/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/14/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/19/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/19/2011