Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/19/2011