Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/10/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/01/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 06/02/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/07/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/07/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/23/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/26/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/29/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 12/19/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/19/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/19/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/19/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/19/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/19/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/19/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/19/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/19/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/19/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 12/19/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/19/2011