Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/11/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2011