Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2012