Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/24/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/13/2012