Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/09/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2012