There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom to Invest Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a temporary dividends received deduction for 2011 or 2012.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2011 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/11/2011 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2011 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/22/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/29/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/19/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/21/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/11/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/29/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/20/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/11/2011 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Corporate finance and management
  • Income tax deductions
  • Interest, dividends, interest rates
  • Taxation of foreign income
  • Unemployment

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1834. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/11/2011)

Freedom to Invest Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend the election allowed to a U.S. corporation to deduct dividends received from a controlled foreign corporation to the corporation's last taxable year beginning before the enactment of this Act or the first taxable year beginning during the one-year period beginning on such enactment date, and (2) reduce the amount of such tax deduction for corporations that fail to maintain specified employment levels for full-time U.S. employees.