Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/13/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/25/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/31/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/02/2011