Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/30/2011