Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/11/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/01/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/02/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/21/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/23/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/29/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/30/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/30/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 08/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 08/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/23/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/13/2011