Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/23/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/24/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/25/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/13/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/13/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/13/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/16/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/16/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/16/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/16/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/08/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/18/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/27/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/27/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/27/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/01/2011