Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/11/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/14/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/09/2012