Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/20/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/05/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/09/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 08/09/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/09/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 08/09/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/09/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2012