Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/20/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/20/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/20/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/09/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/25/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/30/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/19/2012