Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/02/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/02/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/27/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/11/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/16/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/30/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/10/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2012