Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/25/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/22/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2011