Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/21/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/21/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/07/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/28/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/15/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/09/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/09/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2012