Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/26/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/08/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/31/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/22/2012