Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/24/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/03/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/31/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/21/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/2012